Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/30/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/21/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/13/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2012