Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/27/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/27/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/28/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/28/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/28/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 04/16/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/24/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/24/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/08/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/15/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/11/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/01/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/13/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/13/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/27/2012