Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/25/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/08/2012