Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/25/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/06/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/17/2012
Rep. Curson, David Alan [D-MI-11] 12/17/2012