As of 02/19/2019 text has not been received for H.R.4290 - Homeowner Tax Fairness Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeowner Tax Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the income exclusion for discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness, to provide exclusions from income for certain payments under the National Mortgage Settlement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/28/2012Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E477)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/08/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/21/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/21/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/28/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4290. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2012)

Homeowner Tax Fairness Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) extend through 2015 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence, (2) extend through 2014 the tax deduction for mortgage insurance premiums, (3) exclude from gross income any National Mortgage Settlement amount, and (4) deny a tax deduction for any National Mortgage Settlement amount paid in exchange for a full release of the potential civil claims of the United States under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.

Defines "National Mortgage Settlement amount" as any amount received pursuant to the settlement in a legal action against Bank of America Corporation filed in U.S. District Court on March 12, 2012, which is: (1) a payment for transitional assistance; (2) a payment from the Borrower Payment Fund under the National Mortgage Settlement to a borrower whose home was finally sold or taken in foreclosure after December 31, 2007, and before January 1, 2012; or (3) a payment received as a result of a foreclosure or excess charge of interest that the Department of Justice (DOJ) has determined was not in compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.