Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/30/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/30/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/16/2012