Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/27/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/17/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/22/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/31/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/19/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/26/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/09/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2012