Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/28/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/28/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/26/2012