Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/31/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/27/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/15/2012