Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/11/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/12/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/26/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/28/2012