Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/19/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2012