Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/01/2012