Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/11/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2012