Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/15/2012