Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/26/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/26/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/05/2012