Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/09/2012