Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/01/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/06/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/11/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/28/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/28/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/05/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/11/2012