Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/08/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 08/02/2012