Refine your search

12 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
07/06/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-141. (TXT | PDF)
07/06/2012 Signed by President.
07/02/2012 Presented to President.
06/29/2012 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 74 - 19. Record Vote Number: 172.(consideration: CR S4751-4760)
06/29/2012 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 373 - 52 (Roll no. 451).
06/28/2012 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.(text of conference report: CR H4432-4601)
06/28/2012 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 112-557 filed.
05/08/2012 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/24/2012 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Boxer; Baucus; Rockefeller; Durbin; Johnson SD; Schumer; Nelson FL; Menendez; Inhofe; Vitter; Hatch; Shelby; Hutchison; Hoeven pursuant to the order of 3/7/2012.
04/24/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/18/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 293 - 127 (Roll no. 170).
04/16/2012 Introduced in House