Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/27/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/27/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/17/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/17/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/30/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/21/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/21/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/12/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/12/2012