There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STOP Identity Theft Act of 2012
Stopping Tax Offenders and Prosecuting Identity Theft Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to House

STOP Identity Theft Act of 2012
Stopping Tax Offenders and Prosecuting Identity Theft Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

STOP Identity Theft Act of 2012
Stopping Tax Offenders and Prosecuting Identity Theft Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide effective criminal prosecutions for certain identity thefts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/01/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/31/2012 H5510-5511)
07/31/2012Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-639.
04/16/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/17/2012SenateS.Amdt.3343 Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
08/02/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
08/01/2012-8:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/01/2012-8:48pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/31/2012 H5510-5511)
08/01/2012-8:48pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5619)
07/31/2012-8:32pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (TX) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/31/2012-8:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4362.
07/31/2012-8:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5510-5514)
07/31/2012-8:15pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/31/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 460.
07/31/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-639.
07/10/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/10/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/09/2012HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
04/19/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/16/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/16/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/16/2012 Referred to
07/10/2012 Markup by
07/31/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-639
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security04/19/2012 Referred to
07/09/2012 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary08/02/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (08/01/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Stopping Tax Offenders and Prosecuting Identity Theft Act of 2012 or the STOP Identity Theft Act of 2012 - Calls for the Attorney General to: (1) make use of all existing resources of the Department of Justice (DOJ), including task forces, to bring more perpetrators of tax return identity theft to justice; and (2) take into account the need to concentrate efforts in areas of the country where the crime is most frequently reported, to coordinate with state and local authorities to prosecute and prevent such crime, and to protect vulnerable groups from becoming victims or otherwise being used in the offense.

Amends the federal criminal code to: (1) define "means of identification" to mean any name or number used to identify a specific person (currently, any specific individual); and (2) make tax fraud a predicate offense for aggravated identity theft.

Directs the Attorney General to include in the first annual DOJ performance report made more than nine months after the date of this Act's enactment information as to progress in implementing this Act regarding: (1) information readily available to DOJ about trends in the incidence of tax return identity theft, (2) the effectiveness of statutory tools in aiding DOJ in prosecuting it, (3) recommendations on additional statutory tools that would aid in removing barriers to effective prosecution, and (4) the status of implementing DOJ's March 2010 audit report on DOJ efforts to combat identity theft.