Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/16/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/07/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/10/2012