Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/17/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/23/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/21/2012