Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/18/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/18/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/18/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/20/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/13/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/21/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/28/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/30/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/30/2012