There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Planning for American Energy Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Planning for American Energy Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to establish goals for an all-of-the-above energy production plan strategy on a 4-year basis on all onshore Federal lands managed by the Department of the Interior and the Forest Service.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/15/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-530.
04/18/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/15/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 378.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-530.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/16/2012Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/26/2012Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
04/19/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/18/2012Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/18/2012 Referred to
05/16/2012 Markup by
06/15/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-530
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources04/19/2012 Referred to
04/26/2012 Hearings by
05/16/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4381. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (06/15/2012)

Planning for American Energy Act of 2012 - Amends the Mineral Leasing Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior (the Secretary) and the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to publish every four years a Quadrennial Federal Onshore Energy Production Strategy to direct federal land energy development and department resource allocation in order to promote the energy security of the United States.

Instructs the Secretary to consult with the Administrator of the Energy Information Administration on the projected energy demands of the United States for the next 30 years and on how energy derived from federal onshore lands can put the United States on a trajectory that meets such demand during the next 4 years, with a goal for increasing energy independence and production.

Requires the Secretary to determine a domestic strategic production objective for the development of energy resources from such lands.

Expresses the sense of Congress that federally recognized Indian tribes may elect to set their own production objectives as part of the Strategy.

Grants the relevant Secretary all necessary authority to make determinations regarding which additional federal lands available for leasing at the time the lease sale occurs will be available to meet the production objectives established by the strategies. Directs the Secretary to also take all necessary actions to achieve such objectives unless the President determines that it is not in U.S. national security and economic interests to increase federal domestic energy production and to further decrease dependence upon foreign energy sources.

Requires the Secretary, within 12 months of this Act's enactment, to complete a programmatic environmental impact statement in accordance with certain requirements under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA). Deems such statement sufficient to be in compliance with NEPA requirements for all necessary resource management and land use plans associated with implementation of the Strategy.

Requires the Secretary to submit to: (1) the President and Congress, each proposed strategy, together with comments received from the affected states, federally recognized tribes, and local governments prior to publishing it; and (2) Congress the first Strategy within 18 months of enactment.