Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/05/2012