Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 04/18/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/24/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/18/2012