Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/11/2012