Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/06/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/19/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/24/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2011