Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/26/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/15/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/17/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/04/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/04/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/08/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/16/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/10/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2011