Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/29/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/01/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/26/2012