There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions on persons responsible for the detention, abuse, or death of Sergei Magnitsky, and for other gross violations of human rights in the Russian Federation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/19/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/07/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/07/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/19/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/19/2012Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
04/19/2012Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
04/19/2012Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
04/19/2012Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/19/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E594-595)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/19/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/01/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/05/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/19/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/27/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/17/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/24/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/26/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/30/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/30/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/02/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/07/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/07/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/13/2012

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/19/2012 Referred to
06/07/2012 Markup by
House Judiciary04/19/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement04/19/2012 Referred to
House Financial Services04/19/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4405. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/19/2012)

Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012 - Directs the Secretary of State to publish and update a list of each person the Secretary has reason to believe: (1) is responsible for the detention, abuse, or death of Sergei Magnitsky, participated in related liability concealment efforts, financially benefited from Sergei Magnitsky's detention, abuse, or death, or was involved in the criminal conspiracy uncovered by Sergei Magnitsky; or (2) is responsible for extrajudicial killings, torture, or other human rights violations committed against individuals seeking to expose illegal activity carried out by Russian officials, or against persons seeking to promote human rights and freedoms.

Makes an alien on such list ineligible to enter or be admitted to the United States. Revokes any visa issued for such person. Authorizes the Secretary to waive such prohibition if in the U.S. national security interest. Requires congressional notification of any such waiver.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to freeze and prohibit U.S. property transactions of an individual who is on the list or who acts as an agent for a listed individual. Authorizes the Secretary to waive such actions if in the U.S. national security interest. Requires congressional notification of any such waiver.

Subjects a person who violates, attempts to violate, or causes a violation of such prohibitions to specified penalties.

Terminates this Act 10 years after its enactment.