Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/01/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/05/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/06/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/19/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/27/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/17/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/19/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/24/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/26/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/26/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/30/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/30/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 08/02/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/02/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/07/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/07/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/13/2012