Committees: H.R.443 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/25/2011 Referred to
10/05/2011 Markup by
12/08/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-318
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs02/03/2011 Referred to
09/22/2011 Hearings by
10/05/2011 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce01/25/2011 Referred to
12/08/2011 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/09/2011 Referred to
Senate Indian Affairs12/15/2011 Referred to
06/28/2012 Markup by
12/13/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-250