Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/24/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/08/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/18/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/01/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/27/2012