Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/14/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/02/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/16/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/07/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/28/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/05/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/26/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/30/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/07/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/02/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew