Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/2011