Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/15/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/18/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/08/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/04/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/21/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/10/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 09/13/2012