Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/15/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/06/2011