Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/15/2011