Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/09/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/29/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/06/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/26/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/02/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/07/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/14/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/14/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/29/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/26/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/17/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/25/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/25/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/25/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/25/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/25/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/25/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/25/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/25/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/26/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/26/2012