There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the issuance of right-of-way permits for natural gas pipelines in Glacier National Park, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-268. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013Presented to President.
01/02/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8666)
12/17/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 286 - 10 (Roll no. 627).(text: CR H6811)
07/26/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-627.
04/24/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
01/14/2013Became Public Law No: 112-268. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2013Signed by President.
01/03/2013HousePresented to President.
01/02/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/02/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8666)
12/18/2012SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/17/2012-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/17/2012-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 286 - 10 (Roll no. 627). (text: CR H6811)
12/17/2012-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6813-6814)
12/17/2012-4:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/17/2012-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4606.
12/17/2012-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6811-6812)
12/17/2012-4:31pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/26/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451.
07/26/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-627.
07/11/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/11/2012HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
07/11/2012HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
06/08/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
05/29/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/29/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/24/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/24/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/24/2012 Referred to
07/26/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-627
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources05/29/2012 Referred to
07/11/2012 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands05/29/2012 Referred to
06/08/2012 Hearings by
07/11/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4606. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-268 (01/14/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 26, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to issue right-of-way permits for natural gas pipelines (including all appurtenances used in their operation) that, as of March 1, 2012, are within the boundary of Glacier National Park in Montana.

Specifies that each such permit shall be: (1) issued as a right-of-way renewal, (2) for a width of not more than 25 feet on either side of the centerline of the pipeline, and (3) subject to any terms and conditions that are determined by the Secretary to be necessary.