Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/11/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/23/2011