Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/25/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/25/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/26/2012