Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/09/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/09/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/09/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/11/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/11/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/11/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/17/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/10/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/30/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/30/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/30/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/06/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/11/2011