There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

HALE Scouts Act
Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

HALE Scouts Act
Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts

Short Titles as Reported to House

HALE Scouts Act
Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts

Short Titles as Introduced

HALE Scouts Act
Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

HALE Scouts Act
Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the conveyance of approximately 140 acres of land in the Ouachita National Forest in Oklahoma to the Indian Nations Council, Inc., of the Boy Scouts of America, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
04/02/2012Became Public Law No: 112-103. (TXT | PDF)
04/02/2012Signed by President.
03/22/2012Presented to President.
03/15/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2012Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1760)
10/03/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6475)
09/23/2011Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-218.
01/26/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/02/2012Became Public Law No: 112-103. (TXT | PDF)
04/02/2012Signed by President.
03/22/2012HousePresented to President.
03/15/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/15/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2012SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1760)
10/04/2011SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
10/03/2011-4:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2011-4:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6475)
10/03/2011-4:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 473.
10/03/2011-4:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6475-6476)
10/03/2011-4:25pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/23/2011HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
09/23/2011HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-218.
07/20/2011HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/20/2011HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/20/2011HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
06/14/2011HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
02/04/2011HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/26/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/26/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/26/2011 Referred to
07/20/2011 Markup by
09/23/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-218
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands02/04/2011 Referred to
06/14/2011 Hearings by
07/20/2011 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry10/04/2011 Referred to
03/15/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.473. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-103 (04/02/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 23, 2011. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Help to Access Land for the Education of Scouts or HALE Scouts Act - Requires the conveyance of specified National Forest System land in the Ouachita National Forest in Oklahoma to the Indian Nations Council, Inc., of the Boy Scouts of America. Excludes from such conveyance any land within the Indian Nations National Scenic and Wildlife Area designated under the Winding Stair Mountain National Recreation and Wilderness Area Act.
Requires the Council to pay to the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) the fair market value of the land, as determined by an appraisal approved by the Secretary and done to conform with the Uniform Appraisal Standards for Federal Land Acquisitions and the provisions relating to exchanges of public lands and interests within the National Forest System under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976.

States that access to the conveyed land shall be from the adjacent land of the Council or its successor. Bars the Secretary from being required to provide additional access to such land.

Authorizes the Secretary to prescribe such terms and conditions on the conveyance as the Secretary considers in the public interest, including the reservation of access rights to the conveyed land for administrative purposes.