Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/01/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/01/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/30/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/31/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/13/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/06/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/29/2012