Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/09/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/15/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/17/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/27/2012