Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/29/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/19/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/26/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2012