Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/02/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 10/11/2011